CHRISTIANS IN HEALTH CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Occasional grants to Christian healthcare professionals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 December 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Austin LYONS CBE | Chair | 11 November 1994 |
|
|
||||
Maura Brigid Lyons | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Angelica Mariana Gheorghe | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.50k | £1.00k | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25TH NOVEMBER, 1988.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF DECLARATION OF TRUST).
Area of benefit
UK AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 GROVE ROAD
NORTHWOOD
HA6 2AP
- Phone:
- 01923825634
- Email:
- howardlyons@msn.com
- Website:
-
christiansinhealthcare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window