Financial history THE WILLIAM DELAFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £656.44k £569.49k £670.98k £775.25k £433.33k
Total expenditure £648.22k £624.64k £677.89k £779.81k £14.67m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £656.44k £569.49k £670.98k £775.25k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £555.19k £534.37k £570.48k £684.68k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £93.03k £90.28k £107.41k £95.13k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.11k £4.62k £4.98k £5.67k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £536.17k £515.06k £547.78k £658.94k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £93.03k £90.20k £107.41k £95.05k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A