THE WILLIAM DELAFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants mainly for the restoration of records or archives of historical societies/bodies or restoration of historic churches - recipients are usually restricted to bodies within or bordering the counties of Bedfordshire Bucks or Oxfordshire and of known interest to the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 December 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS EDWARD GILMAN | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BIANCA KAMALA SILVA | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN GEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £656.44k | £569.49k | £670.98k | £775.25k | £433.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £648.22k | £624.64k | £677.89k | £779.81k | £14.67m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £656.44k | £569.49k | £670.98k | £775.25k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £555.19k | £534.37k | £570.48k | £684.68k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £93.03k | £90.28k | £107.41k | £95.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.11k | £4.62k | £4.98k | £5.67k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £536.17k | £515.06k | £547.78k | £658.94k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £93.03k | £90.20k | £107.41k | £95.05k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE THEREOF TO OR TOWARDS OR IN FURTHERANCE OR ADVANCEMENT OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHAITIES CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IF MORE THAN ONE IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES HEREINAFTER IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL RESPECTIVELY SELECT AND THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RWK Goodman
Godstow Court
Minns Business Park
Oxford
OX2 0JB
- Phone:
- 01865268664
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window