Financial history THE CHEMICAL STRUCTURE ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity number: 328042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £53 £6.69k £1 £5.22k £350
Total expenditure £6.90k £15.43k £0 £19.16k £5.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A