Financial history AID FOR CHAD

Charity number: 328051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £35.50k £23.29k £33.06k £33.65k £35.61k
Total expenditure £37.89k £28.97k £27.78k £32.89k £37.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A