GAGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
None at the moment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 February 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL HERMANN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS HERMANN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.55k | £7.74k | £11.02k | £13.63k | £11.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £8.00k | £0 | £0 | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 March 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 NOV 1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING THERAPY AND MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC THROUGH PLAYING OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN EASTERN EUROPEAN ART. (4) THE CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (5) THE PROMOTION OF THE INDUSTRY AND SCIENCE OF BUILDING AND CONSTRUCTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY BY ENCOURAGING THE DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVING EFFICIENCY OF METHODS PRACTICES AND SKILLS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 5
Heath Lodge
4 St. Albans Road
London
NW5 1RD
- Phone:
- 00420602363192
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window