Financial history THE ARID LANDS AND SUSTAINABLE COMMUNITIES TRUST

Charity number: 328073
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £103.03k £104.00k £94.03k £71.57k £27.45k
Total expenditure £118.51k £104.55k £115.03k £58.87k £51.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A