THE APA EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust was established to advance training and education in the fields of scientific examination and analysis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 February 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathon David Griffin | Chair | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANE MCLAUCHLIN | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Arthur | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL HUNT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.49k | £4.71k | £2.80k | £2.77k | £110 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.34k | £2.81k | £950 | £93 | £5.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2023 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 DECEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF SCIENTIFIC ANALYSIS AND EXAMINATION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING FOR THOSE STUDYING FOR THE QUALIFICATIONS REQUIRED IN ORDER TO BE A PUBLIC ANALYST. (B) TO BENEFIT ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ORGANISATION OR BODY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES PROMOTES THE CAUSE OF SCIENTIFIC EDUCATION WHETHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY.
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 HIGH STREET
BEDMOND
ABBOTS LANGLEY
WD5 0RH
- Phone:
- 07734383707
- Email:
- duncanarthur@eurofins.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window