CHALLENGER SOCIETY FOR MARINE SCIENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the study and application of marine science through research and education. Specifically through contribution to public debate, holding scientific meetings, setting up specialist groups, disseminating knowledge of marine science to the public and the activities of the society to its members and providing financial assistance to students in marine science.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 June 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Maeve Lohan | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Alexander Brearley | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
DR KATHARINE ROSEMARY LASH | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.68k | £24.43k | £20.87k | £28.17k | £38.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.66k | £24.88k | £31.31k | £36.40k | £41.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JULY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 11 MAY 1989 as amended on 25 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE STUDY AND APPLICATION OF MARINE SCIENCE IN ALL ITS DISCIPLINES THROUGH RESEARCH AND EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATIONAL OCEANOGRAPHY CENTRE
WATERFRONT CAMPUS
EUROPEAN WAY
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 3ZH
- Phone:
- 01248382893
- Email:
- m.green@bangor.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window