PEOPLE WORLDWIDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
People Worldwide is a educational, media, communication charity, which aims to reflect and promote the lives of people everywhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 March 1989: Standard registration
- 13 May 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20 | £0 | £15 | £15 | £15 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20 | £0 | £15 | £15 | £15 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCATION INCORPORATED 13TH FEBRUARY 1989
Charitable objects
(1) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF THE TREATMENT OF MEMBERSOF THE COMMUNITY LESS FAVOURABLY THAN OTHER MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RELIGION, COLOUR, RACE, NATIONALITY ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGINS AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS GENERALLY. (2)TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO THE PROBLEMS OF INEQUALITY AS STATED IN (1) ABOVE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY BY PUBLICATIONS AND OTHERWISE IN THE WAYS OF PEACE AND THE PREVENTION OF WAR AND TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN NATIONS AND OF APPROACHES TO WORLD CO-OPERATION IN THEIR RELIGIOUS, SCIENTIFIC, ECONOMIC, POLITICAL AND SOCIAL ASPECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window