THE RON CARBUTT TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 328120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity makes grants to organizations, voluntary groups, and individuals working mainly,but not exclusively, with vunerable young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £51
Total expenditure: £1,989

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley
  • Doncaster
  • Rotherham
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • RON CARBUTT TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET ELLEN CARBUTT Trustee
None on record
DAVID BURKINSHAW Trustee
None on record
MR RONALD CARBUTT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.00k £500 £2.50k £10.43k £51
Total expenditure £3.28k £2.12k £2.41k £9.14k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 14 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 August 2024 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Tivy Dale Drive
Cawthorne
BARNSLEY
S75 4EN
Phone:
01226790443
Website:

No information available