Financial history THE OVE ARUP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 328138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £523.84k £588.08k £479.55k £502.51k £509.39k
Total expenditure £559.47k £242.83k £442.63k £483.30k £508.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £363.14k £453.18k N/A £422.21k £422.82k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £160.07k £134.84k N/A £79.13k £82.76k
Income - Other £622 £58 N/A £1.17k £3.80k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £559.47k £242.83k N/A £483.30k £508.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0