THE BROWNLEE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a grant-making charity. It distributes grants from capital and income for charitable works. Its priorities are to support Evangelical non-ecumenical Churches and charitable activities undertaken by Evangelical Christian bodies and charitable agencies for the support of the elderly and terminally ill. It also may allocate some grants to non-religious charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Nigeria
- Philippines
- Scotland
- South Africa
Governance
- 04 April 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR COLIN JAMES GRIMWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Frances Rachel Barker | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Helen Gray | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.73k | £23.42k | £31.19k | £18.03k | £15.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.92k | £226.31k | £189.07k | £211.01k | £281.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 MARCH 1989
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 ALICE DRIVER ROAD
GRUNDISBURGH
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 6XH
- Phone:
- 01473738856
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window