ISLAMIC RELIEF WORLDWIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Responding to emergencies 2. Caring for orphans and children in need 3. Supporting education 4. Providing access to health care and water 5. Promoting sustainable livelihood 6. Campaigning and advocacy on humanitrian issues
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£275,145,670
Donations and legacies | £246.70m | |
Charitable activities | £23.78m | |
Other trading activities | £4.09m | |
Investments | £577.25k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£235,062,014
Raising funds | £17.61m | |
Charitable activities | £213.39m | |
Other | £4.07m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £936,175 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £21.67m | |
Charitable expenditure | £213.39m | |
Retained for future use | £40.08m |
People

494 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
1000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Burma
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- China
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Greece
- Guinea
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Israel
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Lebanon
- Libya
- Macedonia
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Nepal
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Qatar
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Syria
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Yemen
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 06 April 1989: Standard registration
- ISLAMIC RELIEF (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAROUN ATALLAH | Chair | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hany Soliman | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hossam Said | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Faiza Abdel- Razig Mohammed El Higzi | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kasim Iqbal Hussain Randeree | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Aqsa Noreen Aziz | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Muhammad Osman | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nurhayati Binti Hassan | Trustee | 22 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.35m | £148.99m | £182.94m | £234.18m | £274.69m | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.07m | £129.49m | £173.54m | £193.23m | £235.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £781.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.23m | £1.13m | N/A | £154.49k | £936.18k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £118.08m | £133.16m | £166.89m | £200.16m | £246.70m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.44m | £2.85m | £3.52m | £3.79m | £4.09m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.05m | £12.47m | £11.99m | £29.68m | £23.78m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £698.30k | £1.03m | £700.68k | £398.71k | £451.61k | |
|
Income - Investment | £479.24k | £511.00k | £536.20k | £553.93k | £577.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £59.04k | £10.52k | £12.14k | £0 | £44.78k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £113.22m | £115.46m | £157.22m | £174.34m | £213.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £11.64m | £11.24m | £13.23m | £15.34m | £17.61m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £768.21k | £613.79k | £611.90k | £724.73k | £767.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £396.19k | £488.12k | £456.69k | £424.63k | £382.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £3.22m | £2.80m | £3.10m | £3.55m | £4.07m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.24m | £9.61m | £8.18m | £9.24m | £10.24m | |
|
Long-term investments | £168.81k | £168.81k | £168.81k | £168.81k | £168.81k | |
|
Other assets | £50.90m | £78.17m | £100.01m | £143.45m | £171.48m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £16.82m | £28.10m | £39.11m | £42.65m | £31.80m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 MAR 1989 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, AS A PRACTICAL MANIFESTATION AND APPLICATION OF THE HUMANITARIAN VALUES INSPIRED AND GUIDED BY THE ISLAMIC FAITH, TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1.1.1 THE ALLEVIATION OF HUMAN SUFFERING FOR THOSE WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, INEQUALITIES, INJUSTICES OR CATASTROPHE AND THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY: (A) PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE AND OTHER MEANS OF SAVING LIVES; (B) RAISING AWARENESS AND ADVOCATING FOR THOSE IN NEED; (C) ADVANCING CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION; (D) PROMOTING RELIGIOUS AND HUMAN HARMONY. 1.1.2 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY:- (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. 1.1.3 TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, IN EACH CASE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; 1.1.4. TO ADVANCE HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE, INCLUDING MEDICINES, HOSPITALS AND OTHER MEANS, IN EACH CASE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; AND 1.1.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED AND AGREED BY THE TRUSTEES. 1.2 THE CHARITY WILL ADVANCE THE OBJECTS REGARDLESS OF RACE, GENDER OR RELIGIOUS BACKGROUND. 1.3 NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Islamic Relief Worldwide
19 Rea Street South
BIRMINGHAM
B5 6LB
- Phone:
- 01216055555
- Email:
- IRWTrustees@irworldwide.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.