Financial history THE ST BERNARD TRUST

Charity Number: 328193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £38.89k £35.02k £37.77k £111.84k £30.02k
Total expenditure £46.64k £38.37k £45.97k £46.18k £42.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A