ISSTIP - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF TENSION IN PERFORMANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 October 1989: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- ISSTIP (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF TENSION IN PERFORMANCE (Previous name)
- ISSPIT - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF TENSION IN PERFORMANCE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | 05/04/2005 | 05/04/2006 | 05/04/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.92k | £2.14k | £4.83k | £2.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.98k | £837 | £4.03k | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | 31 January 2009 | 361 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 25 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 MAY 1989
Charitable objects
PRESENTING AND DISSEMINATING, COMMENTING AND CRITICISING AND THEREBY CREATING CHANNELS OF COMMUNICATION IN THE SEARCH FOR AWARENESS AND KNOWLEDGE ABOUT A COMMUNAL HARMFUL BEHAVIOURAL CONDITION ASSOCIATED WITH PERFORMANCE AND TENSION IN PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window