Financial history SAVE A CHILD

Charity number: 328218
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £35.82k £30.67k £32.87k £27.87k £37.00k
Total expenditure £36.95k £34.40k £45.76k £26.44k £26.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A