JEWISH MUSIC INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Jewish Music Institute is dedicated to the celebration, preservation and development of the living heritage of Jewish Music for the benefit of all. The Jewish Music Institute is committed to curating, educating and celebrating Jewish music for the benefit of present and future generations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 1989: Standard registration
- JMI (Working name)
- THE JEWISH MUSIC FESTIVAL TRUST LTD (Previous name)
- THE JEWISH MUSIC HERITAGE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Baker | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yifa Rachel Yaakov | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
William Jake Galinsky | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edward Jonathan Salter Leek | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|||||
LEONARD LOWY | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Inbal Annabel Elad | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Gilbert | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Victor Knapp | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JONATHON EDWARD LYONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NORMAN SOLOMON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.66k | £190.19k | £218.69k | £261.67k | £369.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £227.18k | £153.72k | £209.96k | £256.36k | £283.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 MAY 1989 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 8 JULY 1993 AND AMENDED BY MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND MAY 1989 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION ON 29/4/99
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE JEWISH RELIGION, HISTORY, MUSIC POETRY AND CULTURE AND TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, SCIENCE AND ART THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS, RECITALS, PLAYS, DRAMATIC PERFORMANCES AND OTHER PUBLIC EVENTS AS APPROPRIATE. ALL SUCH OBJECTS TO BE FURTHERED WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Room 464
SOAS University of London
10 Thornhaugh Street
Russell Square
LONDON
- Phone:
- 020 7898 4307
- Email:
- finance@jmi.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window