THE BRITISH INSTITUTE FOR LEARNING AND DEVELOPMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Institute for Learning & Development is a professional membership body for organisations and individuals working in the learning and development sector. The institute runs networking and industry update events as well as servicing its members via the website and online magazine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 July 1989: Standard registration
- 14 February 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BILD (Working name)
- BLA (Working name)
- BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR OPEN LEARNING (Previous name)
- BRITISH LEARNING ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- OPEN LEARNING ASSOCIATION (UK) LTD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.89k | £130.61k | £45.93k | £100.31k | £48.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.23k | £150.96k | £64.52k | £73.75k | £74.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 22 August 2016 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | 22 August 2016 | 23 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 APRIL 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20TH JUNE 1990, AND 12TH MARCH 1991, 7 OCTOBER 2003, 24 JANUARY 2007 AND 10 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
A)TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EFFECTIVE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS EMPLOYED OR INTENDING TO BE EMPLOYED IN INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE AND TO DO THIS PRINCIPALLY BY ENCOURAGING THE USE OF OPEN LEARNING MATERIAL AND OPEN LEARNING METHODS. B) SUBJECT TO THE FOREGOING OBJECT, TO EXTEND SUCH TRAINING TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window