HASNAIN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Tanzania
Governance
- 21 June 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HABIB DATOO | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOHAMMED SADIQ MAMDANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALI THAROO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.66k | £86.54k | £139.14k | £240.32k | £270.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.14k | £83.20k | £134.76k | £187.08k | £362.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 02 May 2025 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 APRIL 1989
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FAMINE, THE SAFEGUARDING OF HEALTH ANDFOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND OTHER PURPOSES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WHICH ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 COMPTON AVENUE
WEMBLEY
HA0 3FD
- Phone:
- 07903986002
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window