THE PETER FRANCIS SMITH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust gives donations to charities local to Leeds, York and surrounding areas, although not exclusively, the trust tends to make donations predominantly to help the prevention and relief of poverty, overseas aid relief and research organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of York
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 August 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TARA SMITH | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGUERITA MARIA DEVENISH SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER FRANCIS SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.39k | £5.40k | £25.00k | £0 | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.24k | £9.62k | £10.97k | £4.68k | £3.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 DECEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS, PURPOSE OR PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Omega
Monks Cross Drive
Huntington
YORK
YO32 9GZ
- Phone:
- 0113 2457222
- Email:
- PFS@MXYORK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window