NATIONAL CAMPAIGN FOR COURTESY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We attempt to impart the message of courtesy to the general public through the media, regular newsletters and various meetings. We invite members of the general public to join us.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 August 1989: Standard registration
- 03 October 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CAMPAIGN FOR COURTESY (Working name)
- NATIONAL CAMPAIGN FOR COURTESY POLITE SOCIETY (Working name)
- CAMPAIGN FOR COURTESY (Previous name)
- THE POLITE SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.12k | £8.17k | £10.98k | £1.53k | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.54k | £3.05k | £8.25k | £2.08k | £1.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 06 March 2020 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 10 MAY 1989 AS AMENDED ON 20 SEPTEMBER 2005 AND 22 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY. IN PARTICULAR THE SOCIETY IS FOUNDED TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC OF ALL AGES AND WALKS OF LIFE IN RESPECT FOR OTHER PEOPLE, GOOD MANNERS, AND COURTEOUS AND CONSIDERATE BEHAVIOUR GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window