THE ASSOCIATION OF VEHICLE RECOVERY OPERATORS' BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty by the provision of financial assistance to members of the Association of Vehicle Recovery Operators, their families and their employees and their families For the promotion of such other charitable purposes as the trustees shall think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 24 August 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC HAMMOND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Eilis Margaret Murray | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eamon Kelly | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY BUNGEY | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL DAVID KILBURN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.99k | £14.12k | £7.90k | £10.30k | £3.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.54k | £2.76k | £15.46k | £9.40k | £19.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2023 | 318 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 January 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 MARCH 1989, AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 30 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION OF VEHICLE RECOVERY OPERATORS, THEIR FAMILIES, AND THEIR EMPLOYEES AND THEIR FAMILIES OR OF ANY OTHER ASSOCIATION TO WHICH ANY RECONSTRUCTION OR AMALGAMATION, THE GOOD-WILL AND ASSETS OF THE ASSOCIATION OF VEHICLE RECOVERY OPERATORS MAY BE TRANSFERRED & THEIR FAMILIES. B) FOR THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Saturn Close
Leighton Buzzard
LU7 3UU
- Phone:
- 01525383484
- Email:
- bwwfca@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window