MAHASI DHAMMA FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the charity is to run a "Meditation Center" to promote the practice of "Satipathana Vipassana Meditation" in the "Theravada Buddhist " tradition . The Centre is open to all regardless of race, creed, or religion .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr THEIN TUN OHN | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thaw Si Htin | Trustee | 03 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chit Chit Tin-U | Trustee | 28 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MIN MIN LATT | Trustee | 13 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
KYAW TUN SOE | Trustee | 29 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr THAN MAUNG LWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR TIN MIHN AUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr THAN KYAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Nyunt Han | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.47k | £64.33k | £56.11k | £51.67k | £71.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.79k | £57.04k | £67.03k | £46.05k | £57.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JULY 1989
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE BUDDHIST FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR THEREVADA BUDDHISM AND TO MAKE PROVISION FOR RELIGIOUS CEREMONIES. TO ESTABLISH A CENTRE FOR THE ACTIVITIES OF THE MAHASI DHAMMA FELLOWSHIP TO BE KNOWN AS THE MAHASI MEDITATION CENTRE AND OF SUCH OTHER CENTRE OR CENTRES FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES AS SHALL BE NECESSARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
420 LOWER BROUGHTON ROAD
SALFORD
M7 2GD
- Phone:
- 01612816242
- Email:
- admin@saraniya.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window