THE FRIENDS OF SAN LORENZO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make grants, for the education of children attending a school in Chile in a very marginalised area of Santiago
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Chile
Governance
- 01 September 1989: Standard registration
- 15 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154 | £125 | £125 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.94k | £9.93k | £6.40k | £5.26k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 08 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 06 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 11 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 18 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JUNE 1989
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION, AND THE RELIEF OF THE POOR BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF SAN LORENZO SCHOOL IN SANTIAGO, CHILE AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION MANAGED BY THE SAN JUAN APOSTOL.
Area of benefit
SCHOOL CATCHMENT AREA OF SAN LORENZO SCHOOL IN SANTIAGO*
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window