CHRISTAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE BY SUPPORTING SUCH OF THE WORK OF INTERNATIONAL MISSIONS INC, A CORPORATE BODY ESTABLISHED IN THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, AS IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Harrow
- Leicestershire
- Nottinghamshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Canada
- United States
Governance
- 21 August 1989: Standard registration
- THE INTERNATIONAL MISSIONS UK TRUST (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN S NELSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter R Clark | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD AUSTIN LYONS | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £1.45k | £1.10k | £440 | £582 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09k | £1.83k | £1.35k | £1.66k | £580 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 AUGUST 1989 AS AMENDED BY TRUSTEES RESOLUTION DATED 30 NOVEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY SUPPORTING SUCH OF THE WORK OF INTERNATIONAL MISSIONS INC, A CORPORATE BODY ESTABLISHED IN THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, AS IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUS 1.1. OF THE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Castle Court
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 6DD
- Phone:
- 07847072867
- Email:
- services@christar.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window