Accounts and annual returns THE BLUEBELL TRUST

Charity number: 328360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 October 2024 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2023 22 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2022 14 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2021 17 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2020 Not Required