Financial history THE BLUEBELL TRUST

Charity number: 328360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/10/2020 03/10/2021 03/10/2022 03/10/2023 03/10/2024
Total gross income £3.63k £3.01k £2.36k £1.82k £1.90k
Total expenditure £5.10k £1.58k £3.14k £1.50k £2.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A