THE SHEEPDROVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust supports initiatives which increase sustainability, biodiversity and organic farming, for example research into organic seed production and nutrition. The trust also supports specific work in educational research and spiritual care for the living and the dying.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 October 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN ANN CRAVEN-JONES | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANABEL KINDERSLEY | Trustee | 19 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIET ELIZABETH KINDERSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARNABAS GUY KINDERSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARRIET ROSE TREUILLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DAVID KINDERSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.81k | £206 | £176 | £104 | £57.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £525.31k | £406.56k | £608.60k | £765.84k | £501.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/05/2015
Charitable objects
FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sheepdrove Organic Farm
Sheepdrove
Lambourn
Hungerford
RG17 7UU
- Phone:
- 01488674705
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window