MODIANO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation supports mainly the arts, helps the poor and a few other charitable organisations. No changes were made to the trust's structures and policies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 October 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liora Modiano | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MODIANO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £200.00k | £200.00k | £200.00k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.35k | £54.80k | £83.54k | £121.25k | £82.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 SEPTEMBER 1989.
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONG ALL MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY BUT IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED OR AT RISK OF BEING UNEMPLOYED OR THOSE LESS ABLE THAN OTHERS TO CARE FOR THEMSELVES. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 3. THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATON WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVINGTHE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED BEING PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AS DEFINED IN SECTION 1 (2) OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958. 4. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF A PARTICULAR LOCALITY. 5. THE PROVISIONS AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC WORKS SERVICES OR AMENITIES WITHIN THE SPIRIT AND INTENDMENT OF THE PREAMBLE TO THE STATUTE OF ELIZABETH I. 6. THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Grosvenor Place
London
SW1X 7HH
- Phone:
- 02070120000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window