Governing document TELFORD CITY TECHNOLOGY COLLEGE TRUST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 AUGUST 1989 AS AMENDED 9 MAY 1990, 14 JANUARY 1992, 31 MARCH 2005 AND 6 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING MAINTAINING CARRYING ON AND DEVELOPING ONE OR MORE SECONDARY SCHOOLS OR COLLEGES OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM WITH A STRONG EMPHASIS ON SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, AND THEIR PRACTICAL APPLICATIONS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.