ST JAMES CHRISTIAN WORKERS' TRUST

Charity Number: 328398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The activity of the Trust is to advance the Christian Religion by employing and/or contributing towards the support of a Christian worker or workers, working within the Parish of St. James, Audley. Providing living accommodation or paying or contributing towards the costs and expenses of providing living accommodation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £16,684
Total expenditure: £18,214

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 October 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kerry Jane Boughey Trustee 24 March 2024
None on record
Trevor Percival Carman Trustee 24 March 2023
THE CHRISTIAN WORKERS' TRUST
Received: 42 days late
STEPHEN PRATT Trustee 22 December 2022
THE CHRISTIAN WORKERS' TRUST
Received: 42 days late
ANNETTE DIANE BEECH Trustee 22 December 2022
THE CHRISTIAN WORKERS' TRUST
Received: 42 days late
Susan Taylor Trustee 20 December 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES THE GREAT, AUDLEY IN THE DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD
Received: On time
THE CHRISTIAN WORKERS' TRUST
Received: 42 days late
MARIE SMITH Trustee 20 December 2022
None on record
Dr PETER ARTHUR THOMAS Trustee
THE CHRISTIAN WORKERS' TRUST
Received: 42 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £43.49k £43.86k £52.15k £44.08k £16.68k
Total expenditure £52.63k £38.17k £48.75k £52.16k £18.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 02 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 06 June 2024 312 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 06 June 2024 312 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 30 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 07 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Wilbrahams Walk
Audley
Stoke-on-Trent
ST7 8HL
Phone:
01782721686
Website:

No information available