THE ATP CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Governance
- 07 November 1989: Standard registration
- 08 September 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 28 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window