THE DRIVING INSTRUCTORS ACCIDENT AND DISABILITY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HELPS EX DRIVING INSTRUCTOR'S
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 October 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 November 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEAN SCOTT MAYER | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|||
CARLY LISA BROOKFIELD | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/10/2020 | 23/10/2021 | 23/10/2022 | 23/10/2023 | 23/10/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 October 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 October 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 October 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 October 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 October 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONGST DRIVING INSTRUCTORS OR FORMER DRIVING INSTRUCTORS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS OR TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY, OR OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEON HOUSE
233 HIGH STREET
CROYDON
CR0 9XT
- Phone:
- 02086865151
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window