THE FRIENDS OF SEVA MANDIR

Charity Number: 328428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE FRIENDS OF SEVA MANDIR IS COMMITTED TO HELPING THE POOREST COMMUNITIES IN RAJASTHAN TO MAKE SUSTAINABLE, LONG-TERM IMPROVEMENTS IN THEIR LIVES. THEY DO SO BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF SEVA MANDIR. THE OFFICERS ARE COMMITTED TO SENDING DIRECTLY TO SEVA MANDIR 100% OF FUNDS RAISED TO ENSURE THE GREATEST POSSIBLE BENEFIT TO THE PEOPLE CONCERNED. NO OVERHEADS ARE DEDUCTED BY THE FRIENDS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £50,711
Total expenditure: £33,650

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 November 1989: Standard registration
  • 18 October 2023: Funds received from 800024 ARYA SAMAJ MIDDLESEX
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TONY BOURNE Chair 28 September 2016
None on record
Bridget Caroline Barker Trustee 22 May 2024
RACE AGAINST DEMENTIA
Received: On time
Aaron Yeganeh Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
David Philip Moorhouse Trustee 18 June 2020
None on record
Vinay Kumar Ghai Trustee 09 December 2019
None on record
Donald Ahelan Baladasan Trustee 06 August 2019
None on record
DEEPU CHINTAMANENI Trustee 07 May 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.64k £64.99k £74.61k £35.27k £50.71k
Total expenditure £61.68k £21.88k £79.92k £59.87k £33.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FRIENDS OF SEVA MANDIR
14 HOLLAND PARK AVENUE
LONDON
W11 3QU
Phone:
07971614636