BARDHAN RESEARCH AND EDUCATION TRUST OF ROTHERHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust's aim is to promote research and education in medicine in general and in particular the field of gastrointestinal disease. The Trust seeks to encourage men and women of any age to pursue research or educational activity. The candidate should have the necessary drive, determination and ability to develop good ideas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 1989: Standard registration
- B R E T (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr D R Cockburn | Chair | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gehan Sri-Pathmananathan | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laurence O'Toole | Trustee | 30 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr S Bardhan | Trustee | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark McAlindon | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LUCY KATE VERNALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.04k | £146.07k | £223.04k | £97.45k | £65.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.32k | £45.65k | £34.07k | £135.94k | £116.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 10 NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF MEDICAL SCIENCE IN THE FIELD OF GASTROENTEROLOGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Kingswood Allotts Limited
Sidings Court
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN4 5NU
- Phone:
- 01142711900
- Email:
- bardhanresearch@gmail.com
- Website:
-
thebret.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window