Financial history THE ATLANTIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 328499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £795 £19.54k £35.50k £31.73k £1.14k
Total expenditure £15.27k £19.03k £35.54k £30.50k £38.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A