Financial history TOGETHER FOR CHRIST HIS KINGDOM AND HIS CHURCH

Charity number: 328513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £127.35k £118.84k £138.70k £153.42k £228.40k
Total expenditure £160.01k £148.59k £668.51k £157.43k £223.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A