Accounts and annual returns THE IRISH ABROAD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328514
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 October 2021 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 08 October 2021 161 days late
Annual return 30 June 2019 28 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 28 April 2020 On Time