Financial history THE IRISH ABROAD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328514
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £87.69k £67.27k £96.18k £56.26k £12.23k
Total expenditure £107.75k £73.45k £83.80k £68.61k £6.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A