PALLE MOELLER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable purposes in education training medical health & sports for deserving ugandans thorugh a committee of vouluntary members submiting and selecting deserving cases to attend to.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Uganda
Governance
- 02 March 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dorothy Moeller | Chair | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Micheal Lumu Moeller | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.05k | £57.39k | £88.14k | £51.22k | £69.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.30k | £60.82k | £54.20k | £40.11k | £262.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 FEBRUARY 1990
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL SUBJECTS OF LEARNING INCLUDING AGRICULTURE, MEDICINE, CRAFTS, BUSINESS AND THE LIBERAL ARTS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. 3. TO PROVIDE HOUSING AND ACCOMMODATION TO THOSE PERSONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHO BY VIRTUE OF THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES. 4. TO PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HEALTH CARE TO THOSE PERSONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHO BY VIRTUE OF THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES. 5. TO RELIEVE PERSONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF DROUGHT, EARTHQUAKE, FLOOD OR OTHER NATURAL DISASTER OR WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Attenboroughs Accountants
Tower House
Tower Centre
HODDESDON
Hertfordshire
EN11 8UR
- Phone:
- 01992468536
- Email:
- MARK@DAWSONJER.COM
- Website:
-
WWW.CHARITYCHOICE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window