MARCHING & PERFORMING ARTS UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Marching & Performing Arts United Kingdom is a charitable organisation set up to advance the musical & performing arts education of young people throughout the United Kingdom in all aspects of performing arts, primarily but not exclusively in playing musical instruments, colour guard and dance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 March 1990: Standard registration
- WINTER GUARD UNITED KINGDOM (Working name)
- WINTERGUARD UNITED KINGDOM (Working name)
- DRUM CORPS UNITED KINGDOM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN DAVID THOMPSON | Chair | 22 October 2006 |
|
|||||||
LEE ANTONY JEX | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
BARRY DAVIS | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
John James Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 14 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
LEE RICHARD COURT | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||
MARK ANTHONY GUTTERIDGE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MARK PETER NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.13k | £44.04k | £3.77k | £29.53k | £39.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.16k | £43.54k | £3.31k | £39.16k | £46.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 1 NOVEMBER 1986, 20 APRIL 1991, 21 AUGUST 1993, 22 OCTOBER 2006 AND 7 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL AND PERFORMING ARTS EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM BY HELPING TO TRAIN THEM IN THE PLAYING OF INSTRUMENTS AND USE OF EQUIPMENT BY MEANS OF CONCERTS AND EXHIBITIONS AT WHICH SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE MAY PERFORM TO ADVANCE THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 ERIDGE ROAD
HOVE
BN3 7QD
- Phone:
- 08444877633
- Email:
- admin@mpauk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window