THE EMERSON FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 328555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity's principal object is to make grants and donations for the benefit of a wide range of charitable purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £13,144
Total expenditure: £20,115

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 March 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER EMERSON JONES Trustee 23 February 1990
None on record
AUDREY JONES Trustee 23 February 1990
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £40.88k £55.88k £68.87k £60.08k £13.14k
Total expenditure £34.71k £56.02k £77.09k £56.29k £20.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
EMERSON GROUP
EMERSON HOUSE
HEYES LANE
ALDERLEY EDGE
SK9 7LF
Phone:
01625588400
Website:

No information available