THE FULBRIGHT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education, for the benefit of the public, primarily by enabling citizens of the USA and of the UK to participate in educational exchanges between those two countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 August 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fulbright Foundation (Trustee) Limited | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.49k | £64.47k | £282.13k | £65.55k | £54.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.89k | £67.58k | £16.46k | £77.93k | £48.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY: (1) ENABLING CITIZENS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AND OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND DEPENDANT TERRITORIES NORMALLY RESIDENT IN THEIR RESPECTIVE COUNTRIES PARTICIPATING IN EDUCATIONAL EXCHANGES TO ENGAGE IN PROGRAMMES OF STUDY TEACHING RESEARCH AND EDUCATIONAL TRAINING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA RESPECTIVELY AND FOR THAT PURPOSE GRANTING OR FACILITATING THE GRANT OF STUDENTSHIPS FELLOWSHIPS SCHOLARSHIPS AND OTHER AWARDS. (2) ARRANGING AND/OR FACILITATING LEARNED COLLOQUIA ON SUBJECTS OF ACADEMIC INTEREST, SEMINARS AND EDUCATIONAL CONFERENCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 01 August 1985 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fulbright Foundation
Unit 302
3rd Floor Camelford House
89 Albert Embankment
London
- Phone:
- 02074984010
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window