THE CAROLINE WALKER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Trust in the year under review was the improvement of public health by means of good food. The Trust is a charitable body and was established in 1989 to continue the work of Caroline Walker in her spirit, and in particular to protect the quality of food. The work of the Trust is dependent on revenue from book publishing, report sales, donations and grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 1990: Standard registration
- C W T (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHLEEN DAWN LEWIS MBA, RNutr | Chair | 12 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Catherine Zephir | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lippe | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Stevens | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rana Conway | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Styles | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carly Atkinson | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.10k | £3.41k | £2.14k | £26.81k | £5.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.18k | £4.57k | £3.85k | £5.53k | £32.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.75k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11/10/1989 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/12/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 15/09/1995 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 24/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/12/2013 as amended on 16 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH AND IN PARTICUALR (THOUGH WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO PROTECT THE QUALITY OF FOOD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 WOODFORD ROAD
LONDON
E18 2EA
- Phone:
- 02085329012
- Email:
- info@cwt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window