Financial history THE ASHRAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 328581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £22.41k £22.99k £23.06k £4.54k £23.83k
Total expenditure £20.75k £23.39k £23.58k £12.70k £22.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A