THE ABRAHAM AND SARAH FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To obey and carry out God's commission according to the Bible. To focus on Jesus - the Creator. To teach the young to walk with God as Abraham did. One of the first things that a child learns to do is walk. Work comes afterwards. To rush into work before we have learned to walk is a reversal of God's order. To be ignorant of God has a profound influence on the way we think, work, and live our enti
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- Nigeria
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 12 April 1990: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 03 February 2010: Standard registration
- 14 February 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £340 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £340 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH CONCERNING (I) GOOD RACE RELATIONS AND THE PROMOTION THEREOF (II) CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE WITH PARTICULAR APPLICATION TO INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window