THE SIERRA LEONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OLD BOYS ASSOCIATION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the educational efforts of the sierra Leone Grammar School as aid in facilities not covered by education Authorities. This is done through fund raising activities/donations/ sponsorships and advice,education resource support to meet administrative and materials for educational delivery , assistance to counter and support struggling students facing pooverty and financial.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 May 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ISRAEL OJEKEH PARPER | Chair | 23 April 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2 | £2 | £3 | £3 | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £2 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2025 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2025 | 1096 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SIERRA LEONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL BY THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 HENDERSON CLOSE
STONEBRIDGE PARK
LONDON
NW10 0TP
- Phone:
- 07527131370
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window