THE BALTIC CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of general charitable activities for the public benefit, in particular in the fields of the arts & culture, the advancement of education & training, science, ecology and healthcare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 May 1990: Standard registration
- 04 September 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 September 2013: Funds transferred to 1152843 BALTIC CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.50k | £250.17k | £260.05k | £273.03k | £63.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.41k | £265.14k | £267.95k | £273.43k | £50.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 16 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 07 February 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 23 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 09 February 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 08 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 04 April 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 05 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 02 February 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/12/1989 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19/08/2013
Charitable objects
TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITIES AND SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER INCLUDING PERIODICAL PAYMENTS OF INCOME AND PAYMENT OF CAPITAL SUMS BY INSTALMENTS AND IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOY DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window