THE CENTRE FOR FUN AND FAMILIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre for Fun & Families is a voluntary organisation that has pioneered and developed a range of group work programmes to help parents who are having behaviour difficulties with their children or young people. Our programmes meet the needs of a diverse range of parents and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 1990: Standard registration
- 14 October 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 14 October 2009: Funds transferred to 1128547 Heads Up Leicester Limited
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £459.64k | £399.10k | £380.00k | £465.89k | £282.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £453.45k | £455.93k | £439.65k | £479.04k | £277.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 22 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 24 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 17 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 24 September 2008 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 16 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 20 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 20 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 July 2006 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 July 2006 | 181 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 MAY 1990.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE FAMILIES AND THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE, THE IMPORTANCE OF SOUND RELATIONS BETWEEN PARENTS AND CHILDREN FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND ENRICHMENT OF FAMILY LIFE AND GOOD INTERPERSONAL COMMUNICATION BETWEEN ADULTS AND CHILDREN PARTICULARLY, THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN FAMILIES, AND TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND WELFARE OF FAMILIES AND THEIR MEMBERS, BEING IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR CIRCUMSTANCES, OR THEIR PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL OR SPIRITUAL STATE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window